NY A06991 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for paid time off for port authority of New York and New Jersey police officers who become ill or injured while in the performance of their duties as to necessitate medical or other remedial treatment.
Title
Provides for paid time off for port authority of New York and New Jersey police officers who become ill or injured while in the performance of their duties as to necessitate medical or other remedial treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.333 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1790 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6274 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.491 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06274 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6991