NY A06995 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture and markets to issue code red and blue alerts for companion animals during extreme weather; requires owners of companion animals to bring their animals indoors whenever a code red or blue alert has been issued.
Title
Requires the department of agriculture and markets to issue code red and blue alerts for companion animals during extreme weather; requires owners of companion animals to bring their animals indoors whenever a code red or blue alert has been issued.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 6995a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04577 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE