NY A07044 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to the New York city school construction authority to 2024.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to the New York city school construction authority to 2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.86 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.360 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7044 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1267 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6319 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.360 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06319 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.86