NY A07047 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.673
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.673
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a plea of guilty.
Title
Relates to a plea of guilty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.673 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |