NY A07049 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the local food, farms, and jobs act; relates to the procurement of locally grown farm and food products; sets goals for levels of procurement by state agencies; creates the New York state council on food policy.
Title
Enacts the local food, farms, and jobs act; relates to the procurement of locally grown farm and food products; sets goals for levels of procurement by state agencies; creates the New York state council on food policy.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | print number 7049a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S02244 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE