NY A07050 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the radon task force's reporting date to November 1, 2020.
Title
Extends the radon task force's reporting date to November 1, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.225 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-01 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-01 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.210 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | substituted for a7050 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.400 |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | substituted by s5070 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.210 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05070 (Same As) 2019-08-30 - SIGNED CHAP.225