NY A07058 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.596
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.596
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the uniform partition of heirs property act which supplements the general partition statute and governs actions to partition heirs property.
Title
Establishes the uniform partition of heirs property act which supplements the general partition statute and governs actions to partition heirs property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.596 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.599 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7058a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1691 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4865A |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4865a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.599 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.599 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7058a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04865 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.596