NY A07068 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "adjoining owners' bill of rights"; requires the department of buildings to make available on its website an "adjoining owners' bill of rights" advising homeowners who are adjacent to a property under development or construction of their rights and available resources.
Title
Relates to enacting the "adjoining owners' bill of rights"; requires the department of buildings to make available on its website an "adjoining owners' bill of rights" advising homeowners who are adjacent to a property under development or construction of their rights and available resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | print number 7068b |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | print number 7068a |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05784 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES