NY A07070 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.220
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to residency requirements for members of municipal departments of sanitation; removes the five years of service residency issue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to residency requirements for members of municipal departments of sanitation; removes the five years of service residency issue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.220
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.613
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5438A
2018-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.99
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.99
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyprint number 7070a
2018-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2017-04-04Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05438 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7070A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07070
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07070A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07070&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7070#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback