NY A07080 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - signed chap.247
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - signed chap.247
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to motor vehicle key and key fob replacement contracts if such becomes inoperable, lost or stolen.
Title
Relates to motor vehicle key and key fob replacement contracts if such becomes inoperable, lost or stolen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Senate | signed chap.247 |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.247 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2848A |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7080a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.269 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02848 (Same As) 2019-09-06 - signed chap.247