NY A07103 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.670
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.670
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of temporary and disability assistance and the department of corrections and community supervision to examine and make recommendations on current sanctions placed by the state and local social services districts on individuals prior to and after their release from incarceration as part of the individual's re-entry planning.
Title
Directs the office of temporary and disability assistance and the department of corrections and community supervision to examine and make recommendations on current sanctions placed by the state and local social services districts on individuals prior to and after their release from incarceration as part of the individual's re-entry planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.670 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.540 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | substituted for a7103 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to correction |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.242 |
2019-02-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s3550 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.540 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S03550 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.670