NY A07104 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-03 - print number 7104a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits the amount of employer contributions to the state retirement system; authorizes an annual increase in employer contribution of the lesser of two percent or an inflation factor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the amount of employer contributions to the state retirement system; authorizes an annual increase in employer contribution of the lesser of two percent or an inflation factor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03Assemblyprint number 7104a
2014-03-03Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2013-05-01Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S02592 (Same As) 2014-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 2592B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback