NY A07104 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5059
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the imposition of sales and compensating use taxes in Putnam county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the imposition of sales and compensating use taxes in Putnam county.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s5059
2015-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.552
2015-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.552
2015-06-17Assemblyreported
2015-06-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-04-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05059 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.201

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback