NY A07105 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to apportionment of public moneys to school districts employing eight or more teachers in high need districts.
Title
Relates to apportionment of public moneys to school districts employing eight or more teachers in high need districts.
Sponsors
Asm. Gary Finch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04705 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION