NY A07124 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to registration fees and continuing education requirements for license renewal.
Title
Relates to registration fees and continuing education requirements for license renewal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.200 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.160 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7124 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s2039 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.160 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.160 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S02039 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.200