NY A07129 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.132
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts of the Mahopac Central school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects.
Title
Validates certain acts of the Mahopac Central school district with regard to certain capital improvement projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.132 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.386 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7129a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4949A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.610 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4949a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.386 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.386 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7129a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04949 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.132