NY A07151 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-21 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enactment of this legislation would permit persons with licenses to sell beer or wine products for consumption off premises to provide beer samples.
Title
Permits persons with licenses to sell beer or wine products for consumption off premises to provide beer samples in their licensed establishments.
Sponsors
Asm. Sam Hoyt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-04 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-01-06 | referred to economic development | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-03-25 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S3246 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - referred to codes