NY A07151 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - substituted by s3918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - substituted by s3918
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, until September 30, 2014, the authority of the New York state environmental facilities corporation to expand its direct investment authority of Clean Water State Revolving Fund ("CWSRF") monies to include any security obligation available to municipalities under the General Municipal Law.
Title
Extends, until September 30, 2014, the authority of the New York state environmental facilities corporation to expand its direct investment authority of Clean Water State Revolving Fund ("CWSRF") monies to include any security obligation available to municipalities under the General Municipal Law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s3918 |
2011-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.410 |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-04-13 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03918 (Same As) 2011-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.70