NY A07155 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - print number 7155d
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - print number 7155d
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the waterfront commission act, relating to empowering the waterfront commission to accept applications in the longshoremen's register.
Title
Amends the waterfront commission act, relating to empowering the waterfront commission to accept applications in the longshoremen's register.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Assembly | print number 7155d |
2012-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-02-10 | Assembly | print number 7155c |
2012-02-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7155b |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | print number 7155a |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2011-04-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04668 (Same As) 2012-04-17 - PRINT NUMBER 4668C