NY A07155 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4745b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4745b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the date of enrollment in the child health insurance plan; establishes date of enrollment as the date of the child's birth, if the applicant for insurance applies prior to the child's birth or up to 60 days following the child's birth, or on the date the applicant for insurance applies for coverage if the application is made more than 60 days after the child's birth.
Title
Relates to the date of enrollment in the child health insurance plan; establishes date of enrollment as the date of the child's birth, if the applicant for insurance applies prior to the child's birth or up to 60 days following the child's birth, or on the date the applicant for insurance applies for coverage if the application is made more than 60 days after the child's birth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4745b |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.553 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.553 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 7155b |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7155a |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04745 (Same As) 2015-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.31