NY A07178 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes references in law from "hearing impaired" to "deaf or hard of hearing".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes references in law from "hearing impaired" to "deaf or hard of hearing".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.221
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-04-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-04-30Senate3RD READING CAL.152
2018-04-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6128
2018-03-22SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-03-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-22Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.503
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.548
2017-05-22Assemblyreported
2017-04-12Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S06128 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7178

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback