NY A07178 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to failure to obtain an alteration permit or certificate of occupancy for a multiple dwelling; makes such crimes a felony.
Title
Relates to failure to obtain an alteration permit or certificate of occupancy for a multiple dwelling; makes such crimes a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | print number 7178a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03674 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES