NY A07183 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires water works corporations and municipal water systems to annually calculate and submit to the public service commission their water cost index.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires water works corporations and municipal water systems to annually calculate and submit to the public service commission their water cost index.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatetabled
2018-12-21Senatevetoed memo.302
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2057
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8225
2018-04-23SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2018-04-23Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-23Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-19Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.741
2018-04-17Assemblyreported
2018-03-20Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-03-01Assemblyprint number 7183a
2018-03-01Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2017-04-12Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S08225 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7183A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07183&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07183&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07183
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07183&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07183A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07183&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07183&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07183&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7183#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback