NY A07183 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.357
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.357
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expediting actions involving insurance claims for damages resulting from a state disaster emergency.
Title
Relates to expediting actions involving insurance claims for damages resulting from a state disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.357 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | print number 7183a |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03173 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY