NY A07190 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the real property transfer tax return relating to residential property sold or purchased by a limited liability company to include information on the ownership of such company.
Title
Requires the real property transfer tax return relating to residential property sold or purchased by a limited liability company to include information on the ownership of such company.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.297 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.543 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7190 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.132 |
2019-01-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1730 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.543 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S01730 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.297