NY A07192 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - substituted by s4830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the provisions of the Welfare Reform Act of 1997 to 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the provisions of the Welfare Reform Act of 1997 to 2017.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-15Assemblysubstituted by s4830
2015-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.267
2015-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.267
2015-06-10Assemblyreported
2015-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2015-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2015-04-27Assemblyreferred to social services

Same As/Similar To

S04830 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.187

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback