NY A07192 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing the commission on African American history and achievement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing the commission on African American history and achievement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to education
2017-06-14Assemblyprint number 7192a
2017-06-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to education
2017-04-12Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S05454 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback