NY A07194 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to cooperate with investigations by certain committees of the United States Congress under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires the commissioner of taxation and finance to cooperate with investigations by certain committees of the United States Congress under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.91 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.63 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | substituted for a7194a |
2019-05-08 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | AMENDED 5072A |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.520 |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | substituted by s5072a |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.63 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.63 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7194a |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05072 (Same As) 2019-07-08 - SIGNED CHAP.91