NY A07216 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a passenger commuter ferry operator or crew.
Title
Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a passenger commuter ferry operator or crew.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7216a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04171 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to codes