NY A07218 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Passed on August 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - signed chap.194
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to tanning facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to tanning facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16Senatesigned chap.194
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.198
2018-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5585A
2018-04-25SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-04-25Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-04-25Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.505
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.398
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.398
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-05-26Assemblyprint number 7218a
2017-05-26Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2017-04-12Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S05585 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7218A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07218
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07218A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07218&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7218#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback