NY A07229 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants Tier I status to Cynthia Falletta in the Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York with a membership date of June 1, 1972.
Title
Grants Tier I status to Cynthia Falletta in the Teachers' Retirement System of the City of New York with a membership date of June 1, 1972.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05165 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5165A