NY A07237 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-24 - print number 7237b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-24 - print number 7237b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appointment of an independent fiduciary upon the closing of a charter school to develop and implement the dissolution plan of such charter school, including the distribution of assets.
Title
Requires the appointment of an independent fiduciary upon the closing of a charter school to develop and implement the dissolution plan of such charter school, including the distribution of assets.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Assembly | print number 7237b |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | print number 7237a |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04933 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION