NY A07246 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - VETOED MEMO.292
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - VETOED MEMO.292
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medication assisted treatment for substance abuse disorders; prohibits prior authorization.
Title
Relates to medication assisted treatment for substance abuse disorders; prohibits prior authorization.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Diane Richardson [D] | Asm. Robert Carroll [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.292 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.456 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7246b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5935A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-14 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1170 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5935a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.456 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.456 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 7246b |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 7246a |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05935 (Same As) 2020-01-01 - VETOED MEMO.292