NY A07249 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 7249a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - print number 7249a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to member contribution per centum increases.
Title
Relates to member contribution per centum increases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Assembly | print number 7249a |
2020-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05842 (Same As) 2020-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5842A