NY A07251 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to publishers or manufacturers providing printed instructional materials for college students with disabilities, in relation to extending the provisions of such chapter.
Title
Relates to publishers or manufacturers providing printed instructional materials for college students with disabilities, in relation to extending the provisions of such chapter.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Michael Reilly [R] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | signed chap.171 |
2019-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1043 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5999 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.312 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05393 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
S05999 (Same As) 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171
S05999 (Same As) 2019-08-16 - signed chap.171