NY A07282 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the public service commission to require water-works corporations to provide certain residents with non-billing related information.
Title
Authorizes the public service commission to require water-works corporations to provide certain residents with non-billing related information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.263 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.545 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07011 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS