NY A07286 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-5)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.
Title
Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S05627 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - referred to ways and means