NY A07289 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a tax exemption for improvements to the property of severely injured members of the armed forces of the United States; authorizes localities to adopt a local law or resolution granting an exemption from taxation and special ad valorem levies for real property altered or improved for the purposes of removing architectural barriers that challenge the mobility of a severely injured member of the armed forces of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a tax exemption for improvements to the property of severely injured members of the armed forces of the United States; authorizes localities to adopt a local law or resolution granting an exemption from taxation and special ad valorem levies for real property altered or improved for the purposes of removing architectural barriers that challenge the mobility of a severely injured member of the armed forces of the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1674
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1681
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.163
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.163
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-18Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S01681 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7289

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07289&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07289&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07289
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07289&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07289&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07289&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07289&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A7289#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback