NY A07294 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides electors with the power of initiative and referendum.
Title
Provides electors with the power of initiative and referendum.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03397 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY