NY A07306 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - print number 7306a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-15 - print number 7306a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Title
Establishes a twenty-five year retirement program for members of the NYC employees' retirement system employed as water supply police; provides for employer pick-up of certain additional member contributions required to be made by certain participants in the 25-year retirement programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Assembly | print number 7306a |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05251 (Same As) 2020-05-01 - PRINT NUMBER 5251A