NY A07321 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to validating certain grants of lands and charters made by the king of Great Britain before October 14, 1775 and giving the legislature certain authority.
Title
Relates to validating certain grants of lands and charters made by the king of Great Britain before October 14, 1775 and giving the legislature certain authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-05-17 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S03396 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY