NY A07331 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - signed chap.137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to clarifying that reasonable accommodation to enable a person with a disability to use and enjoy a dwelling includes the use of an animal to alleviate the symptoms or effects of a disability.
Title
Relates to clarifying that reasonable accommodation to enable a person with a disability to use and enjoy a dwelling includes the use of an animal to alleviate the symptoms or effects of a disability.
Sponsors
Asm. Erik Dilan [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.137 |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-02-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.410 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6172 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.266 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.436 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06172 (Same As) 2020-08-11 - signed chap.137