NY A07332 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - print number 7332b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - print number 7332b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.
Title
Relates to authorizing small business tax-deferred savings accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Assembly | print number 7332b |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | print number 7332a |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02412 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - PRINT NUMBER 2412B