NY A07334 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.427
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gas pipeline facilities to accelerate the repair, rehabilitation, and replacement of equipment or pipelines that are leaking or at a high risk of leaking; requires the public service commission to establish a standard definition and methodology for calculating and reporting unaccounted-for gas.
Title
Requires gas pipeline facilities to accelerate the repair, rehabilitation, and replacement of equipment or pipelines that are leaking or at a high risk of leaking; requires the public service commission to establish a standard definition and methodology for calculating and reporting unaccounted-for gas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.427 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | print number 7334b |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7334a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S03210 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 3210A