NY A07354 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.524
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.524
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Town of Brookhaven to grant Maryhaven Center of Hope, Inc. of East Patchogue a property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes the Town of Brookhaven to grant Maryhaven Center of Hope, Inc. of East Patchogue a property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.524 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.506 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a7354a |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1160 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5599A |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5599a |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.506 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.506 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | print number 7354a |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2019-04-26 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05599 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.524