NY A07372 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to transfers of cable systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to transfers of cable systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1836
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6466
2019-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.549
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S06466 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7372

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback