NY A07373 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - print number 7373a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-28 - print number 7373a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes writer's salaries and fees within production costs eligible for the empire state film production credit.
Title
Includes writer's salaries and fees within production costs eligible for the empire state film production credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-28 | Assembly | print number 7373a |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05370 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE