NY A07393 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to enacting the "community financial services access and modernization act of 2019"; modernizes existing statute to reflect the full scope of financial services available at neighborhood "check cashing" establishments; provides for a comprehensive regulatory framework for the delivery of the expanded financial services currently being offered.
Title
Relates to enacting the "community financial services access and modernization act of 2019"; modernizes existing statute to reflect the full scope of financial services available at neighborhood "check cashing" establishments; provides for a comprehensive regulatory framework for the delivery of the expanded financial services currently being offered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | print number 7393a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S05423 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO BANKS