NY A07402 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.222
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of taxation and finance to study and report on the impact on localities in the counties of Westchester, Putnam and Dutchess of state-owned lands, and the methods of compensating such localities for the real property taxes lost as a result of such state-owned lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of taxation and finance to study and report on the impact on localities in the counties of Westchester, Putnam and Dutchess of state-owned lands, and the methods of compensating such localities for the real property taxes lost as a result of such state-owned lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.222
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2041
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5481A
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.312
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.312
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyprint number 7402a
2018-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-04-25Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05481 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7402A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07402&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07402&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07402
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07402&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07402A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07402&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07402&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07402&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7402#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback