NY A07438 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.428
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to arbitration organizations; requires private arbitration organizations involved in fifty or more consumer arbitrations per year to collect, publish at least quarterly, and make available to the public in a computer-searchable database certain information relating to such arbitrations; prohibits financial conflicts of interest.
Title
Relates to arbitration organizations; requires private arbitration organizations involved in fifty or more consumer arbitrations per year to collect, publish at least quarterly, and make available to the public in a computer-searchable database certain information relating to such arbitrations; prohibits financial conflicts of interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.428 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02895 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION